Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4495 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill May 2, 2023

Engrossed

Bill June 27, 2023
Bill June 13, 2023

Enrolled

Bill July 7, 2023

Chaptered

Bill July 27, 2023