House
|
11/08/2023
|
Assigned Pa 183'23 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 11/07/2023 02:12 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 11/07/2023 01:04 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 10/26/2023 02:02 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/19/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/19/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 555 Yeas 36 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/10/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/10/2023
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Regulatory Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 222 Yeas 100 Nays 9 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/16/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Tullio Liberati
|
|
|