Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4561 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill May 16, 2023

Engrossed

Bill October 19, 2023
Bill June 22, 2023

Enrolled

Bill October 23, 2023

Chaptered

Bill November 8, 2023