House | 06/06/2024 | Assigned Pa 53'24 | ||
House | 06/06/2024 | Filed With Secretary Of State 06/06/2024 02:00 Pm | ||
House | 06/06/2024 | Approved By The Governor 06/06/2024 12:00 Pm | ||
House | 06/04/2024 | Presented To The Governor 06/03/2024 04:14 Pm | ||
House | 05/15/2024 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | ||
House | 05/15/2024 | Full Title Agreed To | ||
House | 05/15/2024 | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | Inserted Full Title | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 198 Yeas 35 Nays 1 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 11/14/2023 | Referred To Committee On Health Policy | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Transmitted | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 560 Yeas 58 Nays 49 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Substitute (h-1) Adopted | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/16/2023 | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Introduced By Representative Felicia Brabec |