Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4580 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill May 16, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 15, 2024
Bill November 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2024

Chaptered

Bill June 7, 2024