Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4608 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill May 23, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 10, 2024
Bill October 19, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 17, 2024

Chaptered

Bill April 30, 2024