House
|
07/30/2024
|
Assigned Pa 85'24 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
07/30/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 07/23/2024 11:38 Am
|
|
|
House
|
07/30/2024
|
Approved By The Governor 07/23/2024 09:38 Am
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2024
|
Presented To The Governor 07/11/2024 01:18 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2024
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2024
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2024
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 275 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2024
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Veterans And Emergency Services
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 5 Yeas 100 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/23/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Introduced By Representative John Fitzgerald
|
|
|