Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4689 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill May 30, 2023

Engrossed

Bill June 28, 2023
Bill June 20, 2023

Enrolled

Bill July 6, 2023

Chaptered

Bill July 13, 2023