House
|
12/31/2023
|
Assigned Pa 245'23 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 11/30/2023 10:22 Am
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 11/29/2023 05:18 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 11/27/2023 03:22 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 695 Yeas 33 Nays 2 Excused 3 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Energy And Environment
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 259 Yeas 100 Nays 8 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/07/2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Sharon Macdonell
|
|
|