Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4706 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill June 7, 2023

Engrossed

Bill November 8, 2023
Bill June 28, 2023

Enrolled

Bill November 16, 2023

Chaptered

Bill December 1, 2023