House
|
07/30/2024
|
Assigned Pa 87'24
|
|
|
House
|
07/30/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 07/23/2024 11:42 Am
|
|
|
House
|
07/30/2024
|
Approved By The Governor 07/23/2024 09:42 Am
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2024
|
Presented To The Governor 07/11/2024 01:08 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2024
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2024
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2024
|
Roll Call Roll Call # 281 Yeas 56 Nays 54 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2024
|
Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2024
|
Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Full Title
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2024
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2024
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 269 Yeas 24 Nays 14 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 391 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/03/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/03/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/08/2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Laurie Pohutsky
|
|
|