Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4718 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill June 8, 2023

Engrossed

Bill June 20, 2024
Bill October 19, 2023

Enrolled

Bill July 2, 2024

Chaptered

Bill July 25, 2024