House | 12/31/2023 | Assigned Pa 242'23 | ||
House | 12/31/2023 | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/30/2023 10:16 Am | ||
House | 12/31/2023 | Approved By The Governor 11/29/2023 05:12 Pm | ||
House | 12/31/2023 | Presented To The Governor 11/27/2023 03:06 Pm | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Returned From Senate Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Passed Roll Call # 698 Yeas 23 Nays 12 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Transmitted | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 481 Yeas 56 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Title Amended | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Substitute (h-2) Adopted | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/08/2023 | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | Referred To Committee On Government Operations | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | Introduced By Representative Ranjeev Puri |