Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4720 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill June 8, 2023

Engrossed

Bill November 8, 2023
Bill November 2, 2023

Enrolled

Bill November 27, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis May 15, 2024

Chaptered

Bill December 1, 2023