House
|
10/10/2023
|
Assigned Pa 147'23 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
10/10/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 10/10/2023 11:40 Am
|
|
|
House
|
10/10/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 10/10/2023 10:00 Am
|
|
|
House
|
10/03/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 10/03/2023 09:14 Am
|
|
|
House
|
09/28/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
09/28/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
09/28/2023
|
Roll Call Roll Call # 329 Yeas 102 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
09/28/2023
|
Senate Substitute (s-5) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
09/27/2023
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
09/27/2023
|
Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-5) With Immediate Effect And Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/27/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/27/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 479 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/27/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/27/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/27/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-5)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/27/2023
|
Substitute (s-5) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/27/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-5)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-5)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2023
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-5)
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 262 Yeas 100 Nays 8 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Education
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Substitute (h-3) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3)
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/14/2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Matt Koleszar
|
|
|