Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4752 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill June 14, 2023

Engrossed

Bill September 27, 2023
Bill June 28, 2023

Enrolled

Bill October 2, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2023