House
|
02/27/2024
|
Assigned Pa 8'24
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 02/27/2024 11:24 Am
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Approved By The Governor 02/27/2024 10:36 Am
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Presented To The Governor 02/22/2024 02:42 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 18 Yeas 20 Nays 17 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Amendment(s) Defeated
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Regulatory Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Placed On Order Of General Orders
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Discharge Committee Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Agriculture
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 549 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
09/27/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment, Tourism And Outdoor Recreation
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/15/2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Government Operations
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Jenn Hill
|
|
|