Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4825 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill June 15, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 20, 2024
Bill November 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill February 20, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis February 28, 2024

Chaptered

Bill February 27, 2024