House | 12/10/2024 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Returned From Senate Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 12/10/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 472 Yeas 32 Nays 5 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 11/13/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 11/13/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 10/24/2024 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 10/24/2024 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 32 Yeas 83 Nays 22 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | Substitute (h-1) Adopted | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 10/12/2023 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations | ||
House | 06/27/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/22/2023 | ||
House | 06/22/2023 | Referred To Committee On Insurance And Financial Services | ||
House | 06/22/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 06/22/2023 | Introduced By Representative Natalie Price |