Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4842 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill June 22, 2023

Engrossed

Bill December 11, 2024
Bill April 18, 2024

Enrolled

Bill December 18, 2024

Chaptered

Bill January 21, 2025