House
|
03/12/2024
|
Assigned Pa 13'24
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 03/12/2024 11:18 Am
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Approved By The Governor 03/12/2024 10:10 Am
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Presented To The Governor 02/29/2024 02:40 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 40 Yeas 24 Nays 14 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Amendment(s) Defeated
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Local Government
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 509 Yeas 88 Nays 21 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/11/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/11/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/27/2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Agriculture
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Samantha Steckloff
|
|
|