Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4857 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill June 27, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 28, 2024
Bill November 8, 2023

Enrolled

Bill February 29, 2024

Chaptered

Bill March 14, 2024