House
|
12/31/2023
|
Assigned Pa 248'23
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 11/30/2023 10:28 Am
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 11/29/2023 05:24 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 11/27/2023 03:16 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 718 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 389 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
09/26/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
09/26/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
07/19/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 07/18/2023
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Nate Shannon
|
|
|