Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4897 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill July 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill November 9, 2023
Bill October 19, 2023

Enrolled

Bill November 16, 2023

Chaptered

Bill December 1, 2023