House
|
12/13/2024
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2024
|
Re-returned From Senate With Concurrence To House Substitute (h-3) To Senate Substitute (s-10)
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/12/2024
|
Roll Call: Roll Call # 576 Yeas 22 Nays 13 Excused 3 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/12/2024
|
House Substitute (h-3) To Senate Substitute (s-10) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/12/2024
|
Returned From House With Substitute (h-3) To Senate Substitute (s-10)
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/12/2024
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Retransmitted
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Roll Call Roll Call # 331 Yeas 64 Nays 45 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Senate Substitute (s-10) Concurred In As Substituted (h-3)
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Postponed For The Day
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Postponed Temporarily
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Substitute (h-3) Adopted And Amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-10) With Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 207 Yeas 22 Nays 11 Excused 5 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-10)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Substitute (s-10) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-10)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-3)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-3)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 501 Yeas 79 Nays 30 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
07/19/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 07/18/2023
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Tax Policy
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Joey Andrews
|
|
|