Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4906 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill July 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 16, 2024
Bill November 8, 2023

Enrolled

Bill December 19, 2024

Chaptered

Bill January 21, 2025