House
|
12/12/2024
|
Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Title Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
12/12/2024
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/11/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 487 Yeas 21 Nays 15 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/11/2024
|
Title Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/10/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/10/2024
|
Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/10/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 515 Yeas 68 Nays 41 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Substitute (h-2) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2)
|
|
|
House
|
07/19/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 07/18/2023
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Samantha Steckloff
|
|
|