Senate | 07/30/2024 | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Title Amended | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 286 Yeas 60 Nays 50 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Substitute (h-2) Adopted | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) | ||
House | 07/19/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 07/18/2023 | ||
House | 07/18/2023 | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance | ||
House | 07/18/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 07/18/2023 | Introduced By Representative John Fitzgerald |