House
|
12/31/2023
|
Assigned Pa 274'23 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 12/08/2023 10:10 Am
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 12/07/2023 10:00 Am
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 11/27/2023 03:20 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 701 Yeas 32 Nays 3 Excused 3 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Health Policy
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 450 Yeas 82 Nays 28 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
09/28/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
|
|
|
House
|
08/22/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 07/20/2023
|
|
|
House
|
07/20/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
07/20/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Joseph Aragona
|
|
|