Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4923 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill July 20, 2023

Engrossed

Bill November 8, 2023
Bill November 1, 2023

Enrolled

Bill November 16, 2023

Chaptered

Bill December 11, 2023