House
|
12/31/2023
|
Assigned Pa 218'23 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 11/22/2023 01:38 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 11/22/2023 11:32 Am
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 11/21/2023 09:42 Am
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/01/2023
|
Given Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/01/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Retransmitted
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Request Granted
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Enrollment Vacated
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/26/2023
|
Senate Requests Return
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 589 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/19/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/19/2023
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/03/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection
|
|
|
House
|
09/27/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
09/27/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 321 Yeas 105 Nays 5 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
House
|
09/27/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
09/13/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
09/13/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
09/06/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
09/06/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
08/23/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 08/22/2023
|
|
|
House
|
08/22/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Tax Policy
|
|
|
House
|
08/22/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
08/22/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Brenda Carter
|
|
|