Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4926 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill August 22, 2023

Engrossed

Bill October 25, 2023
Bill September 27, 2023

Enrolled

Bill November 13, 2023

Chaptered

Bill November 28, 2023