House
|
03/12/2024
|
Assigned Pa 12'24 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 03/12/2024 11:16 Am
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Approved By The Governor 03/12/2024 10:12 Am
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Presented To The Governor 02/29/2024 02:34 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 23 Yeas 31 Nays 6 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 393 Yeas 85 Nays 24 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
09/28/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
09/28/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
House
|
09/19/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/14/2023
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Tax Policy
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Jenn Hill
|
|
|