Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4979 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 14, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 22, 2024
Bill October 24, 2023

Enrolled

Bill February 27, 2024

Chaptered

Bill March 14, 2024