House
|
07/30/2024
|
Assigned Pa 68'24
|
|
|
House
|
07/30/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 07/08/2024 01:04 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
07/30/2024
|
Approved By The Governor 07/08/2024 09:58 Am
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2024
|
Presented To The Governor 06/25/2024 03:06 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2024
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2024
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 267 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Reassigned To Committee On Housing And Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Placed On Order Of General Orders
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Discharge Committee Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Energy And Environment
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 435 Yeas 56 Nays 54 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Substitute (h-3) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Substitute (h-2) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
House
|
09/26/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/20/2023
|
|
|
House
|
09/20/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment, Tourism And Outdoor Recreation
|
|
|
House
|
09/20/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
09/20/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Ranjeev Puri
|
|
|