Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5028 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 20, 2023

Engrossed

Bill June 20, 2024
Bill November 1, 2023

Enrolled

Bill June 24, 2024

Chaptered

Bill July 9, 2024