House | 12/31/2024 | Full Title Agreed To | ||
House | 12/31/2024 | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title | ||
House | 12/23/2024 | Bill Ordered Enrolled 12/23/2024 | ||
Senate | 12/19/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 628 Yeas 24 Nays 14 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 12/19/2024 | Vote Reconsidered | ||
Senate | 12/19/2024 | Inserted Full Title | ||
Senate | 12/19/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 625 Yeas 20 Nays 14 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 | ||
Senate | 12/10/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 12/10/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 10/31/2024 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 10/31/2024 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 11/02/2023 | Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Transmitted | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 434 Yeas 104 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Substitute (h-1) Adopted | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 10/17/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 10/17/2023 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) | ||
House | 09/27/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/26/2023 | ||
House | 09/26/2023 | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice | ||
House | 09/26/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 09/26/2023 | Introduced By Representative Nate Shannon |