Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5046 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 26, 2023

Engrossed

Bill December 19, 2024
Bill November 1, 2023

Enrolled

Bill January 8, 2025

Chaptered

Bill January 21, 2025