House
|
04/09/2024
|
Assigned Pa 35'24 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 04/02/2024 02:14 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Approved By The Governor 04/02/2024 01:20 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Presented To The Governor 03/20/2024 10:36 Am
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 557 Yeas 68 Nays 38 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Rule Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Returned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 696 Yeas 25 Nays 10 Excused 3 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Amendment(s) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/01/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Local Government
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 426 Yeas 66 Nays 44 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Substitute (h-6) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Substitute (h-5) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Substitute (h-3) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/04/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/04/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
House
|
09/27/2023
|
Per Rule 41 Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance
|
|
|
House
|
09/27/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/26/2023
|
|
|
House
|
09/26/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Tax Policy
|
|
|
House
|
09/26/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
09/26/2023
|
Introduced By Representative John Fitzgerald
|
|
|