Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5048 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 26, 2023

Engrossed

Bill November 8, 2023
Bill October 31, 2023

Enrolled

Bill November 16, 2023

Chaptered

Bill April 2, 2024