Senate | 11/07/2023 | Referred To Committee On Local Government | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Transmitted | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 471 Yeas 105 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 10/03/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 10/03/2023 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 10/03/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/28/2023 | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Introduced By Representative Natalie Price |