House | 12/10/2024 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Full Title Agreed To | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title | ||
Senate | 12/10/2024 | Inserted Full Title | ||
Senate | 12/10/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 477 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 11/13/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 11/13/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 10/31/2024 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 10/31/2024 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 04/30/2024 | Referred To Committee On Health Policy | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 40 Yeas 96 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 10/04/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/03/2023 | ||
House | 10/03/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 10/03/2023 | Introduced By Representative Carrie Rheingans |