LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Michigan MI
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB5078
Draft Versions
MI
Michigan House Bill HB5078
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session
Michigan House Bill HB5078
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
October 3, 2023
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
December 10, 2024
Compare
Bill
April 25, 2024
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
December 18, 2024
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
January 21, 2025
Compare