House
|
05/21/2024
|
Assigned Pa 40'24 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 05/17/2024 02:40 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Approved By The Governor 05/17/2024 01:42 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Presented To The Governor 05/15/2024 10:42 Am
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Roll Call Roll Call # 77 Yeas 69 Nays 38 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Senate Substitute (s-4) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-4) With Immediate Effect And Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 47 Yeas 24 Nays 14 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-4)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Substitute (s-4) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-4)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/01/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/01/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Title Amended
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 427 Yeas 72 Nays 38 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
House
|
10/10/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/05/2023
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Small Business
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Kristian Grant
|
|
|