Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5096 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 5, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 29, 2024
Bill October 31, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 14, 2024

Chaptered

Bill May 20, 2024