House
|
12/31/2024
|
Re-returned From Senate With Concurrence To House Substitute (h-1) To Senate Substitute (s-1) And Full Title
|
|
|
House
|
12/23/2024
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled 12/23/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2024
|
Title Amendment Agreed To
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2024
|
Roll Call: Roll Call # 661 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2024
|
House Substitute (h-1) To Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2024
|
Returned From House With Substitute (h-1) To Senate Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Retransmitted
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Roll Call Roll Call # 332 Yeas 86 Nays 23 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In As Substituted (h-2)
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Substitute (h-2) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 83 Yeas 22 Nays 13 Excused 3 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/01/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Title Amended
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 428 Yeas 79 Nays 31 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted And Amended
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
10/10/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/05/2023
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Small Business
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Jasper Martus
|
|
|