Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5100 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 5, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 19, 2024
Bill October 31, 2023

Enrolled

Bill January 8, 2025

Chaptered

Bill January 15, 2025