House | 07/30/2024 | Assigned Pa 119'24 | ||
House | 07/30/2024 | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/23/2024 12:46 Pm | ||
House | 07/30/2024 | Approved By The Governor 07/23/2024 10:46 Am | ||
House | 07/30/2024 | Presented To The Governor 07/11/2024 01:32 Pm | ||
House | 04/10/2024 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | ||
House | 04/10/2024 | Full Title Agreed To | ||
House | 04/10/2024 | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Inserted Full Title | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 85 Yeas 22 Nays 13 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
Senate | 11/01/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Transmitted | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Title Amended | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 430 Yeas 80 Nays 30 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Substitute (h-1) Adopted | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 10/25/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 10/25/2023 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 10/10/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/05/2023 | ||
House | 10/05/2023 | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Small Business | ||
House | 10/05/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 10/05/2023 | Introduced By Representative Ranjeev Puri |