Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5102 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 5, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 20, 2024
Bill October 31, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 17, 2024

Chaptered

Bill July 25, 2024