House
|
11/07/2024
|
Assigned Pa 149'24
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 10/29/2024 10:57 Am
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2024
|
Approved By The Governor 10/29/2024 10:02 Am
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2024
|
Presented To The Governor 10/28/2024 03:00 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2024
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled 10/08/2024
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2024
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2024
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2024
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 368 Yeas 35 Nays 1 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2024
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2024
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2024
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Veterans And Emergency Services
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 112 Yeas 103 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Postponed Temporarily
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Vote Reconsidered
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Defeated Roll Call # 55 Yeas 55 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 49
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/11/2023
|
|
|
House
|
10/11/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure
|
|
|
House
|
10/11/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/11/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Mike Mcfall
|
|
|